TX HB321 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for certain feminine hygiene products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for certain feminine hygiene products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB388 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Ways & Means

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback