TX HB3209 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the consideration for public school accountability purposes of certain students participating in regional day school programs for the deaf.
Title
Relating to the consideration for public school accountability purposes of certain students participating in regional day school programs for the deaf.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
HEARING DISORDERS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
HEARING DISORDERS