TX HB320 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of an education enhancement program for students with certain disabilities.
Title
Relating to the establishment of an education enhancement program for students with certain disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-08-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-08-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-08-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-08-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-08-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-08-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-08-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-08-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-08-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-08-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-07-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Family
Family--Parent & Child
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Family
Family--Parent & Child