TX HB3193 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the relationship between public employers and fire and police employees.
Title
Relating to the relationship between public employers and fire and police employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#588 (Y: 118 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#571 (Y: 78 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#571 (Y: 78 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |