TX HB3179 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Companion considered in lieu of
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Companion considered in lieu of
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas college work-study program and to establishing a program for the off-campus employment of certain students at public or private institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the Texas college work-study program and to establishing a program for the off-campus employment of certain students at public or private institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3179 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03179I.htm |