TX HB3175 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - HB 3175Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 3175Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 3175Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Health Care Providers
LOUISIANA
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Taxation
Taxation--General
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Health Care Providers
LOUISIANA
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Taxation
Taxation--General