TX HB3172 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 69-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the protection of membership in and support to religious organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the protection of membership in and support to religious organizations.

Sponsors

Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]
Rep. William Zedler [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseReturned to committee
2019-05-09HousePoint of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5)
2019-05-09HousePoint of order overruled Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1978 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback