TX HB3172 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of an electronic information and application system for state incentives for economic development purposes.
Title
Relating to the establishment of an electronic information and application system for state incentives for economic development purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#782 (Y: 115 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF