TX HB3171 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the duties and programs of the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to the duties and programs of the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-02 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Disabled Persons
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Housing--Homeless Persons
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Disabled Persons
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Housing--Homeless Persons