TX HB3160 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to the urban land bank demonstration program in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the urban land bank demonstration program in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-26 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2344 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property