TX HB316 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the advertising and labeling of certain food products.
Title
Relating to the advertising and labeling of certain food products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#970 (Y: 124 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#970 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-10 | House | Amendment withdrawn 1-Biedermann |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB883 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1145 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Postponed 5/25/21 11:40 PM
SB1145 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Postponed 5/25/21 11:40 PM
Subjects
ADVERTISING
FOOD
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
FOOD
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF