TX HB3151 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipalities and counties that adopt budgets that reduce the funding or personnel allocated for law enforcement agencies.
Title
Relating to municipalities and counties that adopt budgets that reduce the funding or personnel allocated for law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. Craig Goldman [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] |
Rep. Sam Harless [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
Governor
Law Enforcement
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
Governor
Law Enforcement