TX HB3145 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Medicaid reimbursement for dental services provided to certain adults with disabilities.
Title
Relating to Medicaid reimbursement for dental services provided to certain adults with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1152 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
DENTAL SERVICES
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID