TX HB3144 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to registration requirements and voluntary safety standards certification for senior living facilities; authorizing administrative penalties; imposing fees; requiring an occupational registration.
Title
Relating to registration requirements and voluntary safety standards certification for senior living facilities; authorizing administrative penalties; imposing fees; requiring an occupational registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Julie Johnson [D] | Rep. John Turner [D] |
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1133 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Aging
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Nursing Homes
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Nursing Homes
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety