TX HB313 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Summary
Relating to certain personal information contained in a decree of dissolution of a marriage or an order in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
Title
Relating to certain personal information contained in a decree of dissolution of a marriage or an order in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time | |
2009-05-15 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-14 | Record vote | |
2009-05-14 | Passed | |
2009-05-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-13 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-08 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-11-20 | Filed |
Subjects
DIVORCE
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Family--Parent & Child
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
SUPREME COURT
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Family--Parent & Child
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
SUPREME COURT