TX HB3125 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to charitable raffles conducted by the charitable foundations of certain professional sports teams.
Title
Relating to charitable raffles conducted by the charitable foundations of certain professional sports teams.
Sponsors
Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Tony Dale [R] |
Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#953 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#953 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR100 (Enabling for) 2017-05-30 - Filed with the Secretary of State