TX HB3123 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to governmental entities subject to the sunset review process.
Title
Relating to governmental entities subject to the sunset review process.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-01 - House - HB 3123Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 5 by Elkins (Y: 62 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 3 by Gonzales, Larry (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 5 by Elkins (Y: 62 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 3 by Gonzales, Larry (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House discharges conferees-reported |
2015-05-31 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-31 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-31 | House | House discharges conferees |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2015-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-19 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-19 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-18 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-18 | House | House requests conference committee |
2015-05-18 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-01 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-05-01 | House | Amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-01 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-01 | House | Amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment as amended withdrawn |
2015-04-30 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2015-04-30 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment to amendment tabled |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-30 | House | Amended |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CANCER PREVENTION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
CAPITAL METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
CREDIT UNION COMMISSION
CREDIT UNION DEPARTMENT
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
EXPANDED LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES COUNCIL
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
JUDICIAL CONDUCT, STATE COMMISSION ON
JUVENILE JUSTICE BOARD, TEXAS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
LONE STAR RAIL DISTRICT
MILITARY DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
NORTH TEXAS TOLLWAY AUTHORITY
PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE EMPLOYEE CHARITABLE CAMPAIGN
SULPHUR RIVER BASIN AUTHORITY
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
CAPITAL METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
CREDIT UNION COMMISSION
CREDIT UNION DEPARTMENT
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
EXPANDED LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES COUNCIL
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
JUDICIAL CONDUCT, STATE COMMISSION ON
JUVENILE JUSTICE BOARD, TEXAS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
LONE STAR RAIL DISTRICT
MILITARY DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
NORTH TEXAS TOLLWAY AUTHORITY
PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE EMPLOYEE CHARITABLE CAMPAIGN
SULPHUR RIVER BASIN AUTHORITY
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF