TX HB3111 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to student loan repayment assistance for certain nurses employed by a long-term care facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to student loan repayment assistance for certain nurses employed by a long-term care facility.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2300 (Same As) 2019-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback