TX HB3106 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a requirement that law enforcement agencies enter into a certain database information related to investigations of sexual assault or other sex offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a requirement that law enforcement agencies enter into a certain database information related to investigations of sexual assault or other sex offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1413 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#794 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-16SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-15HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1413
2019-05-15HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-14HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-14HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed
2019-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-01SenateRead first time
2019-04-30SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#794
2019-04-30HousePassed
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-29HouseAmended 1-Goldman
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback