TX HB3102 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a prior authorization requirement for certain prescription eye drops and related medications.
Title
Relating to a prior authorization requirement for certain prescription eye drops and related medications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |