TX HB3101 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing the sale of alcoholic beverages on certain passenger buses; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing the sale of alcoholic beverages on certain passenger buses; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1410 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective immediately
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-21SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-18HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-18HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenatePassed
2017-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-03SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-20HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-03-29HouseRead first time
2017-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback