TX HB3089 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to meetings of school districts' local school health advisory councils.
Title
Relating to meetings of school districts' local school health advisory councils.
Sponsors
Rep. Lacey Hull [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] |
Rep. Shelby Slawson [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Health
Health--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Open Meetings
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Health
Health--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Open Meetings