TX HB3084 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing a municipal clerk to file documents electronically for recording with a county clerk.
Title
Relating to authorizing a municipal clerk to file documents electronically for recording with a county clerk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Electronic Information Systems
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Electronic Information Systems
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB3084 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB03084I.htm |