TX HB3082 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the investment training requirement for certain local government officers.
Title
Relating to the investment training requirement for certain local government officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--Finance
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--Finance
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING