TX HB3073 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement that state agencies make agency guidance documents accessible to the public.
Title
Relating to a requirement that state agencies make agency guidance documents accessible to the public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#871 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#871 |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
INTERNET
Open Records
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Open Records
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure