TX HB3069 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to statutes of limitation and repose for certain claims involving the construction or repair of an improvement to real property or equipment attached to real property.
Title
Relating to statutes of limitation and repose for certain claims involving the construction or repair of an improvement to real property or equipment attached to real property.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Julie Johnson [D] |
Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#677 (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#677 (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#677 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
STATUTES OF LIMITATIONS
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
STATUTES OF LIMITATIONS