TX HB306 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of an open burn pit registry for certain service members and veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of an open burn pit registry for certain service members and veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1344 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#378 (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-13SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1344
2019-05-10HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-02HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-02HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenatePassed
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#378
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB131 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB306
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00306I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00306H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00306E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00306S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00306F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB306&RcdVtNo=378&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-02-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-02-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB306&RcdVtNo=1344&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2019

Bill Comments

feedback