TX HB3059 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Postponed 12/25/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the requirement that motor vehicle dealers apply for the registration of and title for certain vehicles sold by the dealer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the requirement that motor vehicle dealers apply for the registration of and title for certain vehicles sold by the dealer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HousePostponed 12/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1910 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback