TX HB3056 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the participation in the Texas Municipal Retirement System of certain employees of certain municipalities subject to the Texas Local Fire Fighters Retirement Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the participation in the Texas Municipal Retirement System of certain employees of certain municipalities subject to the Texas Local Fire Fighters Retirement Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#973 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Pensions
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback