TX HB3054 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain sentencing procedures in a capital case.
Title
Relating to certain sentencing procedures in a capital case.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Juries
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Courts--Juries
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment