TX HB3050 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to driver's and learner licenses and the issuance of certain driver's licenses and identification certificates; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to driver's and learner licenses and the issuance of certain driver's licenses and identification certificates; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1922 (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1073 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1073 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PEACE OFFICERS
Protection of Personal Information
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Protection of Personal Information
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses