TX HB3043 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the joint planning process for groundwater management.
Title
Relating to the joint planning process for groundwater management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Special Water Districts by chair |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS