TX HB3042 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to designating July 7 as Fallen Law Enforcement Officer Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to designating July 7 as Fallen Law Enforcement Officer Day.


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#470 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Read 2nd time RV#397 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]


2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-22SenateRead first time
2017-04-27SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-25HouseRecord vote
2017-04-25HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2017-03-27HouseRead first time


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments