TX HB3042 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of an instant-ticket lottery game with revenue dedicated to providing grants for breast cancer research, education, and patient treatment and support.
Title
Relating to the creation of an instant-ticket lottery game with revenue dedicated to providing grants for breast cancer research, education, and patient treatment and support.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Charles Hopson [R] | Rep. Tim Kleinschmidt [R] | Rep. Ruth McClendon [D] |
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Beverly Woolley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2011-03-17 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
CANCER
LOTTERIES
LOTTERY COMMISSION, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
CANCER
LOTTERIES
LOTTERY COMMISSION, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF