TX HB3041 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of certain services by the Department of Family and Protective Services as an alternative to removing a child and certain procedures with respect to children in the managing conservatorship of the department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of certain services by the Department of Family and Protective Services as an alternative to removing a child and certain procedures with respect to children in the managing conservatorship of the department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#496 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-28SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-28HouseRecord vote RV#496
2021-04-28HousePassed
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-27HouseAmended 2-Darby and Neave
2021-04-27HouseAmended 1-Frank and Hinojosa
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-19HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-03-19HouseRead first time
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1576 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1576 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3041
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03041I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03041H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03041E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03041S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03041F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03041H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03041H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03041I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03041H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03041H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03041E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03041E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3041&RcdVtNo=496&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=11

Bill Comments

feedback