TX HB3040 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an interim study by the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection regarding the method by which certain trial and appellate judges are selected.
Title
Relating to an interim study by the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection regarding the method by which certain trial and appellate judges are selected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1178 (Y: 122 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1178 (Y: 122 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1178 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1728 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Referred to House Administration
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Judges
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Governor
JUDICIAL SELECTION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPREME COURT
TEXAS INTERIM COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL SELECTION
Courts
Courts--Judges
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Governor
JUDICIAL SELECTION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPREME COURT
TEXAS INTERIM COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL SELECTION