TX HB3039 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the reporting and prosecution of sexual assault, sexual harassment, and sexual misconduct by a member of the state military forces; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the reporting and prosecution of sexual assault, sexual harassment, and sexual misconduct by a member of the state military forces; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-03-27HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback