TX HB3037 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of referral agencies for senior living communities; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to the regulation of referral agencies for senior living communities; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D] | Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#658 (Y: 93 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#658 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1982 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1982 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1982 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Aging
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Nursing Homes
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Nursing Homes
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions