TX HB3037 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contested case hearings for environmental permits.
Title
Relating to contested case hearings for environmental permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2011-03-17 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS