TX HB3036 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to permits for the discharge of waste or pollutants into water that flows into certain areas of the Edwards Aquifer recharge zone.
Title
Relating to permits for the discharge of waste or pollutants into water that flows into certain areas of the Edwards Aquifer recharge zone.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy King [D] | Rep. Jason Isaac [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |