TX HB3028 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to regulation of certain conduct by discount health care program operators, or concerning discount health care programs, that relates to prescription drugs or prescription drug benefits; authorizing administrative and civil penalties.
Title
Relating to regulation of certain conduct by discount health care program operators, or concerning discount health care programs, that relates to prescription drugs or prescription drug benefits; authorizing administrative and civil penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - HB 3028Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - SUSPEND NECESSARY RULES (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - SUSPEND NECESSARY RULES (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed |
2015-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-12 | House | Amended |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS