TX HB3024 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the removal of a public school student from an interscholastic athletic activity on the basis of a suspected concussion.
Title
Relating to the removal of a public school student from an interscholastic athletic activity on the basis of a suspected concussion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#596 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#596 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-01 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations