TX HB3018 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the incorporation of instruction in digital citizenship into the curriculum of certain school districts.
Title
Relating to requiring the incorporation of instruction in digital citizenship into the curriculum of certain school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#732 (Y: 117 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Amended RV#658 (Y: 114 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Amended RV#658 (Y: 114 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#732 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended 1-E. Thompson |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#658 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended 1-Springer |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB885 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum