TX HB3016 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 43-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the carrying of a handgun by a license holder in a motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the carrying of a handgun by a license holder in a motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1002 (Y: 94 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#952 (Y: 87 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#1002
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#952
2019-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-02HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Lang
2019-05-02HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-02HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Lang
2019-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback