TX HB3015 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to vacation leave time accounts for firefighter employee organizations.
Title
Relating to vacation leave time accounts for firefighter employee organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy King [D] | Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1214 (Y: 87 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1186 (Y: 73 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1186 (Y: 73 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | House | Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
City Government--Employees/Officers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General