TX HB3008 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of certain information or assistance by life insurance agents to owners of life insurance policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of certain information or assistance by life insurance agents to owners of life insurance policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-11SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-03-27HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback