TX HB3006 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Motion withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Motion withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Trinity Bay Special Utility District and the powers and duties of the Trinity Bay Conservation District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments or fees.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Trinity Bay Special Utility District and the powers and duties of the Trinity Bay Conservation District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments or fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Motion withdrawn |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Motion to suspend regular order of business |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
TRINITY BAY CONSERVATION DISTRICT
TRINITY BAY SPECIAL UTILITY DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
TRINITY BAY CONSERVATION DISTRICT
TRINITY BAY SPECIAL UTILITY DISTRICT