TX HB30 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the transfer of certain appropriations to the Texas Education Agency and the Teacher Retirement System of Texas and the adjustment of appropriations for public school finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the transfer of certain appropriations to the Texas Education Agency and the Teacher Retirement System of Texas and the adjustment of appropriations for public school finance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#174 (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#70 (Y: 131 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-08-04 - House - Read 2nd time RV#66 (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#36 (Y: 136 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-16 Effective immediately
2017-08-16 Signed by the Governor
2017-08-15 Sent to the Governor
2017-08-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-08-15HouseSigned in the House
2017-08-15HouseReported enrolled
2017-08-15SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-08-15HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-08-15HouseRecord vote
2017-08-15HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-08-15HouseRules suspended
2017-08-15House1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
2017-08-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-08-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-08-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenatePassed
2017-08-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-08-14SenateRecord vote
2017-08-14SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-08-14SenateRecord vote
2017-08-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateRead 2nd time
2017-08-14SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-08-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-08-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-08-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-08-12SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-08-12SenateReferred to Finance
2017-08-12SenateRead first time
2017-08-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-07HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-07HouseRecord vote
2017-08-07HousePassed
2017-08-07HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-04HouseRecord vote
2017-08-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-08-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-02HouseRecord vote
2017-08-02HouseCalendars Committee rule adopted
2017-08-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-07-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-26HousePosting rule suspended
2017-07-26HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-07-26HouseRead first time
2017-07-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB30
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00030I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00030E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00030S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00030F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB30&RcdVtNo=36&Ch=H&Dt=08/02/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB30&RcdVtNo=66&Ch=H&Dt=08/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB30&RcdVtNo=70&Ch=H&Dt=08/07/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-14-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB30&RcdVtNo=174&Ch=H&Dt=08/15/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-15-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback