TX HB2999 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the enforcement of county traffic rules in certain private subdivisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the enforcement of county traffic rules in certain private subdivisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-09SenateReferred to Transportation
2023-05-09SenateRead first time
2023-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2023-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2023-05-06HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#1176
2023-05-06HousePassed
2023-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-06HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-06HousePassed to engrossment
2023-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-06HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-05-03HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-05-02HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-04-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-14HouseReferred to Transportation
2023-03-14HouseRead first time
2023-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback