TX HB2999 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Fort Bend Subsidence District, including a director's qualifications and term.
Title
Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Fort Bend Subsidence District, including a director's qualifications and term.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Gates [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1117 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
FORT BEND SUBSIDENCE DISTRICT
FULSHEAR, CITY OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
FULSHEAR, CITY OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2999 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02999I.htm |